external_commissioner_doering
Data source: ParlGov · About: simonw/parlgov-datasette
308 rows sorted by person_id_source
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: commission_year, one_seat, country_id, commission_name, incumbent, president, data_source, government_party, start_date (date), end_date (date)
Link | rowid | comment | commission_year | elected | portfolio | id | one_seat | country_id | commission_name | incumbent | person_id | person_id_source ▼ | start_date | end_date | score_position | party_id | president | highest_position | data_source | government_party | previous_cabinet_id |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
304 | 304 | 2019 | 1 | Transport | 308 | 1 | Romania 23 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 32 | Adina Vălean | 2019-12-01 | 0.33 | Partidul Naţional Liberal 1015 | 0 | mep/mp | 10 | Orban I 1619 | |||
166 | 166 | 1999 | 1 | economic and monetary affairs | 166 | 0 | Spain 27 | Prodi | 0 | 15779 | Almunia, Joaquin | 2004-04-26 | 2009-10-31 | 1.03 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister employment | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Zapatero I 806 | |
191 | 191 | 2004 | 1 | economic and monetary affairs | 191 | 1 | Spain 27 | Barroso I | 1 | 15779 | Almunia, Joaquin | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.03 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister employment | doering | 10 | Zapatero I 806 | |
225 | 225 | 2010 | 1 | competition | 229 | 1 | Spain 27 | Barroso II | 1 | 15779 | Almunia, Joaquin | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.03 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister employment | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Zapatero II 497 | |
226 | 226 | 2010 | 0 | employment. social affairs and inclusion | 230 | 1 | Hungary 39 | Barroso II | 0 | 16866 | Andor, László | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 0.2 | Magyar Szocialista Párt 1591 | 0 | member of the board of directors EBRD | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Bajnai 162 | |
76 | 76 | 1981 | 0 | competition | 76 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Thorn | 0 | 13160 | Andriessen, Frans | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 2.02 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Van Agt I 563 | |
93 | 93 | 1985 | 0 | agriculture. fisheries | 93 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Delors I | 1 | 13160 | Andriessen, Frans | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 2.02 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Lubbers I 270 | |
111 | 111 | 1989 | 0 | external relations and trade | 111 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Delors II | 1 | 13160 | Andriessen, Frans | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 2.02 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Lubbers II 550 | |
267 | 267 | 2014 | 1 | Health & Food Safety | 271 | 1 | Lithuania 15 | Juncker | 0 | 17117 | Andriukaitis, Vytenis | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.97 | Lietuvos socialdemokratų partija 1277 | 0 | minister of health | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Butkevicius II 1633 | |
257 | 257 | 2014 | 1 | Digital Single Market | 261 | 1 | Estonia 75 | Juncker | 0 | 96 | Ansip, Andrus | 2014-11-01 | 2019-07-01 | 2.25 | Eesti Reformierakond 113 | 0 | prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Roivas I 1095 | |
265 | 265 | 2014 | 1 | Climate Action & Energy | 269 | 1 | Spain 27 | Juncker | 0 | 4248 | Arias Cañete, Miguel | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.92 | Alianza-Partido Popular 645 | 0 | minister for agriculture, food and environment | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Rajoy I 988 | |
220 | 220 | 2004 | 1 | trade | 224 | 1 | United Kingdom 44 | Barroso I | 1 | 9961 | Ashton, Catherine | 2008-10-06 | 2009-10-31 | 1.0 | Labour Party 1556 | 0 | leader of the house of lords | ec.europa.eu | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Brown 119 | |
227 | 227 | 2010 | 1 | high representative of the union for foreign affairs and security policy | 231 | 1 | United Kingdom 44 | Barroso II | 1 | 9961 | Ashton, Catherine | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.0 | Labour Party 1556 | 0 | leader of the house of lords | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Brown 119 | |
268 | 268 | 2014 | 1 | Migration & Home Affairs | 272 | 1 | Greece 41 | Juncker | 0 | 8210 | Avramopoulos, Dimitris | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.91 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | minister of defence | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Samaras II 1060 | |
112 | 112 | 1989 | 1 | industry and single market | 112 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors II | 0 | 2913 | Bangemann, Martin | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 0.99 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | minister economic affairs | doering | 10 | Kohl III 286 | |
128 | 128 | 1993 | 1 | industry | 128 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors III | 1 | 2913 | Bangemann, Martin | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 0.99 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | minister economic affairs | doering | 10 | Kohl IV 862 | |
146 | 146 | 1995 | 1 | industry | 146 | 0 | Germany 54 | Santer | 1 | 2913 | Bangemann, Martin | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 0.99 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | minister economic affairs | doering | 10 | Kohl V 778 | |
167 | 167 | 1999 | 1 | regional policy | 167 | 0 | France 43 | Prodi | 0 | 6420 | Barnier, Michel | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.71 | Rassemblement pour la république 138 | 0 | minister environment | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Jospin 481 | |
228 | 228 | 2010 | 1 | internal market and services | 232 | 1 | France 43 | Barroso II | 0 | 6420 | Barnier, Michel | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.45 | Union pour un mouvement populaire | Les Républicains 658 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Fillon II 306 | |
22 | 22 | 1967 | 0 | economic affairs | 22 | 0 | France 43 | Rey | 0 | 7144 | Barre, Raymond | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.2 | sans étiquette 947 | 0 | professor | doering | 12 | Pompidou IV 662 | |
36 | 36 | 1970 | 0 | economic affairs | 36 | 0 | France 43 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 7144 | Barre, Raymond | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.2 | sans étiquette 947 | 0 | professor | doering | 12 | Chaban-Delmas 111 | |
215 | 215 | 2004 | 1 | president | 216 | 1 | Portugal 63 | Barroso I | 0 | 3890 | Barroso, Jose Manuel | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 2.2 | Partido Social Democrata 1273 | 1 | prime minister | doering | 10 | Santana Lopes 755 | |
251 | 251 | 2010 | 1 | president | 255 | 1 | Portugal 63 | Barroso II | 1 | 3890 | Barroso, Jose Manuel | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 2.2 | Partido Social Democrata 1273 | 1 | prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Socrates II 858 | |
168 | 168 | 1999 | 1 | regional policy | 168 | 0 | France 43 | Prodi | 0 | 10419 | Barrot, Jacques | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 1.13 | Union pour la démocratie française | Mouvement démocrate 509 | 0 | minister for labour and social affairs | doering | 10 | Jospin 481 | |
192 | 192 | 2004 | 1 | transport | 192 | 1 | France 43 | Barroso I | 1 | 10419 | Barrot, Jacques | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.13 | Union pour un mouvement populaire | Les Républicains 658 | 0 | minister for labour and social affairs | doering | 10 | Raffarin III 802 | |
274 | 274 | 2014 | 1 | Internal Market, Industry, Entrepreneurship and SMEs | 278 | 1 | Poland 74 | Juncker | 0 | 17114 | Bieńkowska, Elżbieta | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.42 | Platforma Obywatelska 512 | 0 | deputy prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Kopacz 1146 | |
147 | 147 | 1995 | 1 | environment and nuclear safety | 147 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Santer | 0 | 4640 | Bjerregaard, Ritt | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 1.09 | Socialdemokraterne 1629 | 0 | minister social affairs | doering | 10 | Rasmussen N II 189 | |
23 | 23 | 1967 | 1 | Transport policy | 23 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Rey | 0 | 6040 | Bodson, Victor | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 1.07 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | minister justice | doering | 10 | Werner II 491 | |
169 | 169 | 1999 | 1 | internal market | 169 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Prodi | 0 | 10011 | Bolkestein, Frederik | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 1.0 | Volkspartij voor Vrijheid en Democratie 1409 | 0 | leader party group. minister defence | doering | 10 | Kok II 749 | |
148 | 148 | check munzinger | 1995 | 1 | fisheries. consumer policy | 148 | 0 | Italy 26 | Santer | 0 | 13774 | Bonino, Emma | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 0.33 | Radicali 1296 | 0 | mp/mep | doering | 10 | Berlusconi I 672 |
193 | 193 | 2004 | 1 | fisheries and maritim affairs | 193 | 1 | Malta 72 | Barroso I | 0 | 9806 | Borg, Joe | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.43 | Partit Nazzjonalista 984 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Gonzi I 298 | |
252 | 252 | Malta is not coded in Druckman/Warwick; average position score of finance minister (1.64) used; see codebook | 2010 | 1 | health | 256 | 1 | Malta 72 | Barroso II | 1 | 16218 | Borg, Tonio | 2012-11-28 | 2014-10-31 | 1.64 | Partit Nazzjonalista 984 | 0 | minister finance and economic affairs, foreign minister | afp, dw-05 | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Gonzi II 468 |
37 | 37 | 1970 | 0 | competition. regional policy | 37 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Malfatti/Manshold | 0 | 8219 | Borschette, Albert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Werner III 101 | |
46 | 46 | 1973 | 0 | competition policy | 46 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Ortoli | 1 | 8219 | Borschette, Albert | 1973-01-06 | 1976-12-08 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Werner III 101 | |
113 | 113 | 1989 | 1 | competition policy and finacial services | 113 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Delors II | 0 | 14789 | Brittan, Leon | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.32 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | minister interior | doering | 10 | Thatcher III 297 | |
129 | 129 | 1993 | 1 | external economic affairs | 129 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Delors III | 1 | 14789 | Brittan, Leon | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.32 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | minister interior | doering | 10 | Major II 678 | |
149 | 149 | 1995 | 1 | external economic affairs | 149 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Santer | 1 | 14789 | Brittan, Leon | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 1.32 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | minister interior | doering | 10 | Major II 678 | |
130 | 130 | 1993 | 1 | external political relations | 130 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Delors III | 0 | 14964 | Broek, Hans van den | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.16 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Lubbers III 148 | |
150 | 150 | 1995 | 1 | external political relations (Europe) | 150 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Santer | 1 | 14964 | Broek, Hans van den | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 1.16 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Kok I 637 | |
47 | 47 | 1973 | 0 | energy. research/science and education | 47 | 0 | Germany 54 | Ortoli | 0 | 16418 | Brunner, Guido | 1974-11-11 | 1977-01-05 | 0.2 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Schmidt I 252 | |
63 | 63 | 1977 | 0 | research/science and education | 63 | 0 | Germany 54 | Jenkins | 1 | 16418 | Brunner, Guido | 1977-01-06 | 1980-11-04 | 0.2 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Schmidt II 459 | |
281 | 281 | 2014 | 1 | transport | 285 | 1 | Slovenia 60 | Juncker | 0 | 17121 | Bulc, Violeta | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.07 | Stranka modernega 2333 | 0 | minister without portfolio | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Cerar 1144 | |
64 | 64 | 1977 | 1 | taxation/consumer affairs/transport/EP relations | 64 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Jenkins | 0 | 726 | Burke, Richard | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 1.19 | Fine Gael 1393 | 0 | minister education | doering | 10 | Cosgrave L 315 | |
77 | 77 | time as commissioner was interrupted | 1981 | 1 | taxation/consumer affairs/transport/EP relations | 77 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Thorn | 0 | 726 | Burke, Richard | 1982-04-01 | 1985-01-05 | 1.19 | Fine Gael 1393 | 0 | minister education | doering | 10 | Haughey II 54 |
170 | 170 | 1999 | 1 | research | 170 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Prodi | 0 | 1146 | Busquin, Philippe | 1999-09-16 | 2004-08-13 | 1.13 | Parti Socialiste 1378 | 0 | minister social affairs | doering | 10 | Verhofstadt I 193 | |
171 | 171 | check munzinger | 1999 | 1 | health and consumer protection | 171 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Prodi | 0 | 376 | Byrne, David | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.9 | Fianna Fáil 280 | 0 | attorney general | doering | 10 | Ahern I 126 |
94 | 94 | 1985 | 1 | fisheries | 94 | 1 | Portugal 63 | Delors I | 1 | 13398 | Cardoso e Cunha, Antonio | 1986-01-01 | 1989-01-05 | 0.83 | Partido Social Democrata 1273 | 0 | minister agriculture and fisheries | doering | 10 | Silva I 734 | |
114 | 114 | 1989 | 1 | energy | 114 | 1 | Portugal 63 | Delors II | 0 | 13398 | Cardoso e Cunha, Antonio | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 0.83 | Partido Social Democrata 1273 | 0 | minister agriculture and fisheries | doering | 10 | Silva II 718 | |
1 | 1 | 1958 | 1 | internal market | 1 | 0 | Italy 26 | Hallstein I | 0 | 4616 | Caron, Giuseppe | 1959-12-09 | 1962-01-09 | 0.46 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | junior minister civilian aviation | doering | 10 | Segni II 372 | |
12 | 12 | 1962 | 1 | internal market | 12 | 0 | Italy 26 | Hallstein II | 1 | 4616 | Caron, Giuseppe | 1962-01-10 | 1963-05-16 | 0.46 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | junior minister civilian aviation | doering | 10 | Fanfani III 810 | |
48 | 48 | adviser to the cabinet of Alain Savary (Socialist) and later a member of the Socialist party | 1973 | 0 | development aid/budgets and financial control. | 48 | 0 | France 43 | Ortoli | 0 | 5019 | Cheysson, Claude | 1973-04-19 | 1977-01-05 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Messmer II 607 |
65 | 65 | adviser to the cabinet of Alain Savary (Socialist) and later a member of the Socialist party | 1977 | 0 | development aid | 65 | 0 | France 43 | Jenkins | 1 | 5019 | Cheysson, Claude | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Barre I 21 |
78 | 78 | adviser to the cabinet of Alain Savary (Socialist) and later a member of the Socialist party | 1981 | 0 | development aid | 78 | 0 | France 43 | Thorn | 1 | 5019 | Cheysson, Claude | 1981-01-06 | 1981-06-23 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Barre II 72 |
95 | 95 | adviser to the cabinet of Alain Savary (Socialist) and later a member of the Socialist party | 1985 | 0 | mediterranean policy and north-south relations | 95 | 0 | France 43 | Delors I | 1 | 5019 | Cheysson, Claude | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | 10 | Fabius 843 |
96 | 96 | 1985 | 1 | budget. financial control. personnel | 96 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Delors I | 0 | 6634 | Christophersen, Henning | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 1.88 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Schluter II 195 | |
115 | 115 | 1989 | 1 | economic and financial affairs | 115 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Delors II | 1 | 6634 | Christophersen, Henning | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.88 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Schluter IV 57 | |
131 | 131 | 1993 | 1 | economic and financial affairs | 131 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Delors III | 1 | 6634 | Christophersen, Henning | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.88 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Schluter V 11 | |
229 | 229 | member cabinett Popescu-Tariceanu III; Duration: 2007-04-05 – 2008-11-30. at the time of nomination other parties were in power | 2010 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 233 | 1 | Romania 23 | Barroso II | 0 | 16867 | Cioloş, Dacian | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 0.97 | no party affiliation 761 | 0 | minister agriculture and rural development | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Boc II 993 |
97 | 97 | 1985 | 1 | external relations. trade | 97 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Delors I | 0 | 11859 | Clercq, Willy de | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 1.35 | Partij voor Vrijheid en Vooruitgang | Vlaamse Liberalen en Democraten 1110 | 1 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Martens V 724 | |
98 | 98 | 1985 | 1 | environment. forests. transport | 98 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Delors I | 0 | 16674 | Clinton Davis, Stanley | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 0.5 | Labour Party 1556 | 0 | junior minister | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Thatcher II 646 | |
99 | 99 | 1985 | 1 | internal market. taxation. customs union | 99 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Delors I | 0 | 13788 | Cockfield, Francis A. | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 0.99 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | minister trade | doering | 10 | Thatcher II 646 | |
79 | 79 | 1981 | 0 | transport and fisheries | 79 | 1 | Greece 41 | Thorn | 0 | 10590 | Contogeorgis, Georges | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 0.2 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | diplomat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Rallis 531 | |
24 | 24 | 1967 | 1 | budget and finance | 24 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Rey | 0 | 8852 | Coppe, Albert | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 1.02 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | minister economy | doering | 10 | Vanden Boeynants I 353 | |
38 | 38 | 1970 | 1 | budget and finance | 38 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 8852 | Coppe, Albert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 1.02 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | minister economy | doering | 10 | Eyskens G IV 586 | |
151 | 151 | 1995 | 1 | science. research and development | 151 | 0 | France 43 | Santer | 0 | 12350 | Cresson, Edith | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 2.75 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | prime minister | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Balladur 318 | |
277 | 277 | Maybe add party change? Cretu joined PRO Romania in 2019 (January/March ?), but was not able to get re-elected into the European Parliament in May 2019 | 2014 | 1 | Regional Policy | 281 | 1 | Romania 23 | Juncker | 0 | 17111 | Creţu, Corina | 2014-11-01 | 2019-07-01 | 0.33 | Partidul Social Democrat 1120 | 0 | mp/mep | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Ponta III 1085 |
39 | 39 | 1970 | 1 | foreign trade and foreign affairs | 39 | 0 | Germany 54 | Malfatti/Manshold | 0 | 6242 | Dahrendorf, Ralf | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.82 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Brandt I 358 | |
49 | 49 | 1973 | 1 | research/science and education | 49 | 0 | Germany 54 | Ortoli | 1 | 6242 | Dahrendorf, Ralf | 1973-01-06 | 1974-10-31 | 0.82 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Brandt II 871 | |
231 | 231 | Malta is not coded in Druckman/Warwick; average position score of finance minister (1.64) used; see codebook | 2010 | 1 | health and consumer policy | 235 | 1 | Malta 72 | Barroso II | 0 | 11019 | Dalli, John | 2010-02-10 | 2012-10-16 | 1.64 | Partit Nazzjonalista 984 | 0 | minister finance and economic affairs, foreign minister | afp, dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Gonzi II 468 |
80 | 80 | 1981 | 1 | agriculture | 80 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Thorn | 0 | 16571 | Dalsager, Poul | 1981-01-20 | 1985-01-05 | 1.0 | Socialdemokraterne 1629 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Jorgensen V 379 | |
230 | 230 | 2010 | 1 | maritime affairs and fisheries | 234 | 1 | Greece 41 | Barroso II | 0 | 16868 | Damanaki, Maria | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 0.33 | Panellinio Sosialistikó Kínima 1338 | 0 | mp/mep | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Papandreou G 224 | |
66 | 66 | 1977 | 0 | internal market and industrial affairs | 66 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Jenkins | 0 | 10947 | Davignon, Etienne | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1458 | 0 | diplomat and bureaucrat | doering | 12 | Tindemans II 847 | |
81 | 81 | 1981 | 0 | internal market and industrial affairs/energy | 81 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Thorn | 1 | 10947 | Davignon, Etienne | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1458 | 0 | diplomat and bureaucrat | doering | 12 | Martens IV 453 | |
224 | 224 | 2004 | 1 | development and humanitarian aid | 228 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Barroso I | 0 | 15520 | De Gucht, Karel | 2009-07-17 | 2009-10-31 | 1.28 | Partij voor Vrijheid en Vooruitgang | Vlaamse Liberalen en Democraten 1110 | 0 | minister foreign affairs and european affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Rompuy 80 | |
232 | 232 | 2010 | 1 | trade | 236 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Barroso II | 1 | 15520 | De Gucht, Karel | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.28 | Partij voor Vrijheid en Vooruitgang | Vlaamse Liberalen en Democraten 1110 | 0 | minister foreign affairs and european affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Leterme II 431 | |
110 | 110 | 1985 | 1 | president | 110 | 0 | France 43 | Delors I | 0 | 5804 | Delors, Jacques | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 1.92 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 1 | minister economy and defense | doering | 10 | Fabius 843 | |
127 | 127 | 1989 | 1 | president and monetary affairs | 127 | 0 | France 43 | Delors II | 1 | 5804 | Delors, Jacques | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.92 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 1 | minister economy and defense | doering | 10 | Rocard II 712 | |
145 | 145 | 1993 | 1 | president | 145 | 0 | France 43 | Delors III | 1 | 5804 | Delors, Jacques | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.92 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 1 | minister economy and defense | doering | 10 | Beregovoy I 199 | |
25 | 25 | Check when party UDF was established. Was he a member of it before going to the Commission? | 1967 | 0 | trade policy | 25 | 0 | France 43 | Rey | 0 | 9096 | Deniau, Jean-Francois | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.2 | Union pour la démocratie française | Mouvement démocrate 509 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Pompidou IV 662 |
40 | 40 | Check when party UDF was established. Was he a member of it before going to the Commission? | 1970 | 0 | trade policy | 40 | 0 | France 43 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 9096 | Deniau, Jean-Francois | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.2 | Union pour la démocratie française | Mouvement démocrate 509 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Chaban-Delmas 111 |
50 | 50 | Check when party UDF was established. Was he a member of it before going to the commission? | 1973 | 0 | development aid/budgets and financial control. | 50 | 0 | France 43 | Ortoli | 1 | 9096 | Deniau, Jean-Francois | 1973-01-06 | 1973-04-11 | 0.2 | Union pour la démocratie française | Mouvement démocrate 509 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Messmer I 430 |
172 | 172 | 1999 | 1 | employment and social affairs | 172 | 1 | Greece 41 | Prodi | 0 | 16154 | Diamantopoulou, Anna | 1999-09-16 | 2004-03-10 | 0.5 | Panellinio Sosialistikó Kínima 1338 | 0 | junior minister industry | doering | 10 | Simitis II 33 | |
300 | 300 | 2019 | Justice | 304 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 10682 | Didier Reynders | 2019-12-01 | 1.35 | Mouvement Réformateur 915 | 0 | minister of finance | dw-05 | 10 | Wilmes I 1622 | |||
173 | 173 | 1999 | 1 | employment and social affairs | 173 | 1 | Greece 41 | Prodi | 0 | 15665 | Dimas, Stavros | 2004-03-11 | 2009-10-31 | 0.99 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | minister industry | doering | 10 | Karamanlis Kos I 876 | |
194 | 194 | 2004 | 1 | environment | 194 | 1 | Greece 41 | Barroso I | 1 | 15665 | Dimas, Stavros | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 0.99 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | minister industry | doering | 10 | Karamanlis Kos I 876 | |
258 | 258 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Jonathan Hill since 2016-07-16? (Financial Stability, Financial Services and Capital Markets Union) | 2014 | 1 | Euro & Social Dialogue [+ Financial Stability, Financial Services and Capital Markets Union since 2016-07-16] | 262 | 1 | Latvia 55 | Juncker | 0 | 11889 | Dombrovskis, Valdis | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 2.14 | Vienotība 1666 | 0 | prime minister | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Straujuma I 1073 |
116 | 116 | 1989 | 0 | cultural affairs (broadcasting policy) | 116 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Delors II | 0 | 8707 | Dondelinger, Jean | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 0.33 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | MEP 1974-79; diplomat -- Luxembourgs 'top diplomat' (FT) | doering | 12 | Santer I 175 | |
289 | 289 | 2019 | 1 | Democracy and Demography | 293 | 1 | Croatia 62 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17175 | Dubravka Šuica | 2019-12-01 | 0.2 | Hrvatska demokratska zajednica 276 | 0 | mayor | 10 | Plenkovic II 1512 | |||
298 | 298 | 2019 | 1 | Cohesion and Reforms | 302 | Portugal 63 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 7429 | Elisa Ferreira | 2019-12-01 | 0.81 | Partido Socialista 725 | 0 | minister for environment | 10 | Costa II 1610 | ||||
195 | 195 | 2004 | 1 | external relations + european neighbourhood policy | 195 | 1 | Austria 59 | Barroso I | 0 | 706 | Ferrero-Waldner, Benita | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.18 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Schuessel III 257 | |
196 | 196 | 2004 | 1 | education. training. culture and mulitlingualism | 196 | 1 | Slovakia 1 | Barroso I | 0 | 5535 | Figel, Jan | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-01 | 0.5 | Kresťanskodemokratické hnutie 1432 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Dzurinda II 547 | |
197 | 197 | 2004 | 0 | agriculture and rural development | 197 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Barroso I | 0 | 1017 | Fischer Boel, Mariann | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.0 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister food. agriculture and fisheries | doering | 10 | Rasmussen F I 482 | |
152 | 152 | 1995 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 152 | 1 | Austria 59 | Santer | 0 | 2619 | Fischler, Franz | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 0.86 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | minister agriculture and forestry | doering | 10 | Vranitzky IV 294 | |
174 | 174 | 1999 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 174 | 1 | Austria 59 | Prodi | 1 | 2619 | Fischler, Franz | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.86 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | minister agriculture and forestry | doering | 10 | Klima I 412 | |
132 | 132 | 1993 | 1 | social affairs and employment | 132 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Delors III | 0 | 6689 | Flynn, Padraig | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.24 | Fianna Fáil 280 | 0 | minister justice | doering | 10 | Reynolds I 870 | |
153 | 153 | 1995 | 1 | employment and social affairs | 153 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Santer | 1 | 6689 | Flynn, Padraig | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 1.24 | Fianna Fáil 280 | 0 | minister justice | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Bruton 573 | |
284 | 284 | 2019 | 1 | European Green Deal | 288 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 17107 | Frans Timmermans | 2019-12-01 | 1.16 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister of foreign affairs | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Rutte V 1530 | |||
198 | 198 | 2004 | 0 | justice. freedom and security | 198 | 1 | Italy 26 | Barroso I | 0 | 16235 | Frattini, Franco | 2004-11-22 | 2008-04-23 | 1.69 | Forza Italia – Il Popolo della Libertà 596 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Berlusconi II 256 | |
233 | 233 | 2010 | 1 | enlargement and european neighbourhood policy | 237 | 1 | Czech Republic 68 | Barroso II | 0 | 16869 | Füle, Štefan | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.0 | no party affiliation 1567 | 0 | minister european affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Fischer 157 | |
282 | 282 | 2014 | 1 | Digital Economy and Society | 286 | 1 | Bulgaria 10 | Juncker | 0 | 17163 | Gabriel, Mariya | 2017-07-07 | 2019-11-30 | 0.33 | Grazhdani za Evropeysko Razvitie na Balgariya 1541 | 0 | MEP | 10 | Borisov III 1505 |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE external_commissioner_doering("comment", "commission_year", "elected", "portfolio", "id", "one_seat", "country_id", "commission_name", "incumbent", "person_id", "person_id_source", "start_date", "end_date", "score_position", "party_id", "president", "highest_position", "data_source", "government_party", "previous_cabinet_id", FOREIGN KEY([country_id]) REFERENCES [country]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([party_id]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([data_source]) REFERENCES [info_data_source]([key]), FOREIGN KEY([government_party]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([previous_cabinet_id]) REFERENCES [cabinet]([id]) );
comment 26 ✖