external_commissioner_doering
Data source: ParlGov · About: simonw/parlgov-datasette
217 rows where data_source = "doering" sorted by portfolio
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: comment, commission_year, elected, one_seat, country_id, commission_name, incumbent, president, government_party, start_date (date), end_date (date)
Link | rowid | comment | commission_year | elected | portfolio ▼ | id | one_seat | country_id | commission_name | incumbent | person_id | person_id_source | start_date | end_date | score_position | party_id | president | highest_position | data_source | government_party | previous_cabinet_id |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 10 | 1958 | 1 | 10 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Hallstein I | 0 | 4128 | Schaus, Lambert | 1958-01-10 | 1962-01-09 | 1.07 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | minister economy and defense | doering | 10 | Bech V 500 | ||
20 | 20 | 1962 | 1 | 20 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Hallstein II | 1 | 4128 | Schaus, Lambert | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 1.07 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | minister economy and defense | doering | 10 | Werner I 832 | ||
55 | 55 | 1973 | 1 | Agriculture | 55 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Ortoli | 0 | 16291 | Lardinois, Petrus J. | 1973-01-06 | 1977-01-05 | 0.74 | Katholieke Volkspartij 451 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Biesheuvel II 291 | |
125 | 125 | 1989 | 1 | EC budget and financial control | 125 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors II | 1 | 12760 | Schmidhuber, Peter | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 0.2 | Christlich Soziale Union 1180 | 0 | state junior minister in Bavaria | doering | 10 | Kohl III 286 | |
31 | 31 | 1967 | 1 | External Affairs | 31 | 0 | Italy 26 | Rey | 0 | 3980 | Martino, Edoardo | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.46 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Moro III 433 | |
23 | 23 | 1967 | 1 | Transport policy | 23 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Rey | 0 | 6040 | Bodson, Victor | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 1.07 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | minister justice | doering | 10 | Werner II 491 | |
201 | 201 | 2004 | 1 | administrative affairs. audit and anti-fraud | 201 | 1 | Estonia 75 | Barroso I | 0 | 16396 | Kallas, Siim | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 2.25 | Eesti Reformierakond 113 | 0 | prime minister | doering | 10 | Parts 138 | |
6 | 6 | 1958 | 1 | agriculture | 6 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Hallstein I | 0 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1958-01-10 | 1962-01-09 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Drees IV 761 | |
15 | 15 | 1962 | 1 | agriculture | 15 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Hallstein II | 1 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | De Quay 694 | |
30 | 30 | 1967 | 1 | agriculture | 30 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Rey | 1 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | De Jong 172 | |
42 | 42 | 1970 | 1 | agriculture | 42 | 0 | Italy 26 | Malfatti/Manshold | 0 | 1158 | Scarascia-Mugnozza, Carlo | 1972-03-22 | 1973-01-05 | 0.46 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | junior minister justice | doering | 10 | Andreotti I 398 | |
45 | 45 | 1970 | 1 | agriculture | 45 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 1 | minister agriculture | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | De Jong 172 | |
80 | 80 | 1981 | 1 | agriculture | 80 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Thorn | 0 | 16571 | Dalsager, Poul | 1981-01-20 | 1985-01-05 | 1.0 | Socialdemokraterne 1629 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Jorgensen V 379 | |
83 | 83 | 1981 | 0 | agriculture | 83 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Thorn | 1 | 14835 | Gundelach, Finn Olav | 1981-01-06 | 1981-01-13 | 0.2 | ingen 1128 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Jorgensen V 379 | |
119 | 119 | 1989 | 1 | agriculture | 119 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Delors II | 0 | 16728 | McSharry, Ray | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.83 | Fianna Fáil 280 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Haughey III 77 | |
143 | 143 | 1993 | 1 | agriculture | 143 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Delors III | 0 | 5363 | Steichen, Rene | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.07 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Santer II 418 | |
68 | 68 | 1977 | 0 | agriculture and fisheries | 68 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Jenkins | 1 | 14835 | Gundelach, Finn Olav | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.2 | ingen 1128 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Jorgensen II 50 | |
152 | 152 | 1995 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 152 | 1 | Austria 59 | Santer | 0 | 2619 | Fischler, Franz | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 0.86 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | minister agriculture and forestry | doering | 10 | Vranitzky IV 294 | |
174 | 174 | 1999 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 174 | 1 | Austria 59 | Prodi | 1 | 2619 | Fischler, Franz | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.86 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | minister agriculture and forestry | doering | 10 | Klima I 412 | |
197 | 197 | 2004 | 0 | agriculture and rural development | 197 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Barroso I | 0 | 1017 | Fischer Boel, Mariann | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.0 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister food. agriculture and fisheries | doering | 10 | Rasmussen F I 482 | |
93 | 93 | 1985 | 0 | agriculture. fisheries | 93 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Delors I | 1 | 13160 | Andriessen, Frans | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 2.02 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Lubbers I 270 | |
141 | 141 | 1993 | 1 | budget | 141 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors III | 1 | 12760 | Schmidhuber, Peter | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 0.2 | Christlich Soziale Union 1180 | 0 | state junior minister in Bavaria | doering | 10 | Kohl IV 862 | |
156 | 156 | 1995 | 1 | budget | 156 | 1 | Finland 67 | Santer | 0 | 5160 | Liikanen, Erkki Antero | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 2.01 | Suomen Sosialidemokraattinen Puolue – Finlands Socialdemokratiska Parti 395 | 0 | minister finance | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Aho II 206 | |
177 | 177 | 1999 | 1 | budget | 177 | 1 | Finland 67 | Prodi | 1 | 5160 | Liikanen, Erkki Antero | 1999-09-16 | 2004-07-11 | 2.01 | Suomen Sosialidemokraattinen Puolue – Finlands Socialdemokratiska Parti 395 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Lipponen II 352 | |
185 | 185 | 1999 | 1 | budget | 185 | 0 | Germany 54 | Prodi | 0 | 2882 | Schreyer, Michaele | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.2 | Bündnis 90 / Die Grünen 772 | 0 | minister of a german state | doering | 10 | Schroeder I 107 | |
72 | 72 | 1977 | 1 | budget a financial control. finacial institutions | 72 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Jenkins | 0 | 5942 | Tugendhat, Christopher S. | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.33 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | mep | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Callaghan 590 | |
91 | 91 | 1981 | 1 | budget a financial control. finacial institutions | 91 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Thorn | 1 | 5942 | Tugendhat, Christopher S. | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 0.33 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | mep | doering | 10 | Thatcher I 273 | |
24 | 24 | 1967 | 1 | budget and finance | 24 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Rey | 0 | 8852 | Coppe, Albert | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 1.02 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | minister economy | doering | 10 | Vanden Boeynants I 353 | |
38 | 38 | 1970 | 1 | budget and finance | 38 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 8852 | Coppe, Albert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 1.02 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | minister economy | doering | 10 | Eyskens G IV 586 | |
96 | 96 | 1985 | 1 | budget. financial control. personnel | 96 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Delors I | 0 | 6634 | Christophersen, Henning | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 1.88 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Schluter II 195 | |
67 | 67 | 1977 | 1 | community funds and regional policy | 67 | 0 | Italy 26 | Jenkins | 0 | 8614 | Giolitti, Antonio | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.98 | Partito Socialista Italiano 1475 | 0 | minister budget and economic planning | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Andreotti III 140 | |
82 | 82 | 1981 | 1 | community funds and regional policy | 82 | 0 | Italy 26 | Thorn | 1 | 8614 | Giolitti, Antonio | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 0.98 | Partito Socialista Italiano 1475 | 0 | minister budget and economic planning | doering | 10 | Forlani 464 | |
2 | 2 | 1958 | 0 | competition | 2 | 0 | Germany 54 | Hallstein I | 0 | 16293 | Groeben, Hans von der | 1958-01-10 | 1962-01-09 | 0.2 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Adenauer V 793 | |
13 | 13 | 1962 | 0 | competition | 13 | 0 | Germany 54 | Hallstein II | 1 | 16293 | Groeben, Hans von der | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 0.2 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Adenauer VII 62 | |
26 | 26 | 1967 | 0 | competition | 26 | 0 | Germany 54 | Rey | 1 | 16293 | Groeben, Hans von der | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.2 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Kiesinger 170 | |
34 | 34 | 1967 | 1 | competition | 34 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Rey | 0 | 12016 | Sassen, Emmanuel | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.35 | Katholieke Volkspartij 451 | 0 | minister colonies. head of ep party group | doering | 10 | De Jong 172 | |
73 | 73 | 1977 | 1 | competition | 73 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Jenkins | 1 | 12256 | Vouel, Raymond | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 1.53 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | vice prime minister and finance minister | doering | 10 | Thorn 655 | |
76 | 76 | 1981 | 0 | competition | 76 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Thorn | 0 | 13160 | Andriessen, Frans | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 2.02 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Van Agt I 563 | |
135 | 135 | 1993 | 1 | competition | 135 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Delors III | 1 | 2416 | Miert, Karl van | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.0 | Socialistische Partij 1029 | 0 | leader oppostion party | doering | 10 | Dehaene I 624 | |
158 | 158 | 1995 | 1 | competition | 158 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Santer | 1 | 2416 | Miert, Karl van | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 1.0 | Socialistische Partij 1029 | 0 | leader oppostion party | doering | 10 | Dehaene I 624 | |
46 | 46 | 1973 | 0 | competition policy | 46 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Ortoli | 1 | 8219 | Borschette, Albert | 1973-01-06 | 1976-12-08 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Werner III 101 | |
61 | 61 | 1973 | 1 | competition policy | 61 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Ortoli | 0 | 12256 | Vouel, Raymond | 1976-07-20 | 1977-01-05 | 1.53 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | vice prime minister and finance minister | doering | 10 | Thorn 655 | |
113 | 113 | 1989 | 1 | competition policy and finacial services | 113 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Delors II | 0 | 14789 | Brittan, Leon | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.32 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | minister interior | doering | 10 | Thatcher III 297 | |
37 | 37 | 1970 | 0 | competition. regional policy | 37 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Malfatti/Manshold | 0 | 8219 | Borschette, Albert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Werner III 101 | |
108 | 108 | 1985 | 1 | competition. social affairs | 108 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Delors I | 0 | 12520 | Sutherland, Peter D. | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 0.9 | Fine Gael 1393 | 0 | attorney general | doering | 10 | Fitzgerald II 867 | |
203 | 203 | 2004 | 1 | competiton | 203 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Barroso I | 0 | 10749 | Kroes, Neelie | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 0.92 | Volkspartij voor Vrijheid en Democratie 1409 | 0 | minister transport | doering | 10 | Balkenende III 124 | |
216 | 216 | 2004 | 1 | consumer protection | 220 | 1 | Bulgaria 10 | Barroso I | 0 | 2129 | Kunewa, Meglena | 2007-01-01 | 2009-10-31 | 1.29 | Natsionalno Dvizhenie Simeon Vtori 544 | 0 | minister european affairs | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Stanishev 425 | |
116 | 116 | 1989 | 0 | cultural affairs (broadcasting policy) | 116 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Delors II | 0 | 8707 | Dondelinger, Jean | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 0.33 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | MEP 1974-79; diplomat -- Luxembourgs 'top diplomat' (FT) | doering | 12 | Santer I 175 | |
142 | 142 | 1993 | 1 | customs. taxation | 142 | 0 | France 43 | Delors III | 1 | 5704 | Scrivener, Christiane | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 0.5 | Union pour la démocratie française | Mouvement démocrate 509 | 0 | junior minister consumer affairs | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Beregovoy I 199 | |
133 | 133 | 1993 | 1 | development | 133 | 0 | Spain 27 | Delors III | 1 | 10937 | Marin, Manuel | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 0.5 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | junior minister relations to EC | doering | 10 | Gonzalez III 37 | |
65 | 65 | adviser to the cabinet of Alain Savary (Socialist) and later a member of the Socialist party | 1977 | 0 | development aid | 65 | 0 | France 43 | Jenkins | 1 | 5019 | Cheysson, Claude | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Barre I 21 |
78 | 78 | adviser to the cabinet of Alain Savary (Socialist) and later a member of the Socialist party | 1981 | 0 | development aid | 78 | 0 | France 43 | Thorn | 1 | 5019 | Cheysson, Claude | 1981-01-06 | 1981-06-23 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Barre II 72 |
89 | 89 | 1981 | 1 | development aid | 89 | 0 | France 43 | Thorn | 0 | 12643 | Pisani, Edgard | 1981-01-06 | 1984-12-03 | 1.24 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Barre II 72 | |
48 | 48 | adviser to the cabinet of Alain Savary (Socialist) and later a member of the Socialist party | 1973 | 0 | development aid/budgets and financial control. | 48 | 0 | France 43 | Ortoli | 0 | 5019 | Cheysson, Claude | 1973-04-19 | 1977-01-05 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Messmer II 607 |
50 | 50 | Check when party UDF was established. Was he a member of it before going to the commission? | 1973 | 0 | development aid/budgets and financial control. | 50 | 0 | France 43 | Ortoli | 1 | 9096 | Deniau, Jean-Francois | 1973-01-06 | 1973-04-11 | 0.2 | Union pour la démocratie française | Mouvement démocrate 509 | 0 | bureaucrat | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Messmer I 430 |
180 | 180 | 1999 | 1 | development and humanitarian aid | 180 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Prodi | 0 | 11480 | Nielson, Poul | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.83 | Socialdemokraterne 1629 | 0 | minister energy | doering | 10 | Rasmussen N IV 630 | |
207 | 207 | 2004 | 1 | development and humanitarian aid | 208 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Barroso I | 1 | 14013 | Michel, Louis | 2004-11-22 | 2009-07-17 | 1.28 | Mouvement Réformateur 915 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Verhofstadt II 449 | |
19 | 19 | Munzinger gives no party information. though he was member of a government. I gave him the party score of the government he was a member of. | 1962 | 1 | development policy | 19 | 0 | France 43 | Hallstein II | 0 | 7051 | Rochereau, Henri | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 1.24 | sans étiquette 947 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Debré 692 |
33 | 33 | Munzinger gives no party information. though he was member of a government. I gave him the party score of the government he was a member of. | 1967 | 1 | development policy | 33 | 0 | France 43 | Rey | 1 | 7051 | Rochereau, Henri | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 1.24 | sans étiquette 947 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Pompidou IV 662 |
104 | 104 | 1985 | 1 | development. enlargement | 104 | 0 | Italy 26 | Delors I | 1 | 6114 | Natali, Lorenzo | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 0.83 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Craxi I 334 | |
22 | 22 | 1967 | 0 | economic affairs | 22 | 0 | France 43 | Rey | 0 | 7144 | Barre, Raymond | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.2 | sans étiquette 947 | 0 | professor | doering | 12 | Pompidou IV 662 | |
36 | 36 | 1970 | 0 | economic affairs | 36 | 0 | France 43 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 7144 | Barre, Raymond | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.2 | sans étiquette 947 | 0 | professor | doering | 12 | Chaban-Delmas 111 | |
105 | 105 | 1985 | 0 | economic affairs. employment. credit + investment | 105 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors I | 0 | 14842 | Pfeiffer, Alois | 1985-01-06 | 1987-08-01 | 0.2 | Sozialdemokratische Partei Deutschlands 558 | 0 | union elite | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Kohl II 346 | |
107 | 107 | 1985 | 1 | economic affairs. employment. credit + investment | 107 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors I | 0 | 12760 | Schmidhuber, Peter | 1987-09-22 | 1989-01-05 | 0.2 | Christlich Soziale Union 1180 | 0 | state junior minister in Bavaria | doering | 10 | Kohl III 286 | |
7 | 7 | adviser to socialist minister, socialist candidate in 1962 election | 1958 | 0 | economic and financial affairs | 7 | 0 | France 43 | Hallstein I | 0 | 12005 | Marjolin, Robert | 1958-01-10 | 1962-01-09 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | head of cabinet for minister of foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Gaillard 458 |
16 | 16 | adviser to socialist minister, socialist candidate in 1962 election | 1962 | 0 | economic and financial affairs | 16 | 0 | France 43 | Hallstein II | 1 | 12005 | Marjolin, Robert | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 0.2 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | head of cabinet for minister of foreign affairs | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Debré 692 |
115 | 115 | 1989 | 1 | economic and financial affairs | 115 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Delors II | 1 | 6634 | Christophersen, Henning | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.88 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Schluter IV 57 | |
131 | 131 | 1993 | 1 | economic and financial affairs | 131 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Delors III | 1 | 6634 | Christophersen, Henning | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.88 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Schluter V 11 | |
163 | 163 | 1995 | 0 | economic and financial affairs | 163 | 0 | France 43 | Santer | 0 | 11538 | Silguy, Yves-Thibault de | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 0.2 | Rassemblement pour la république 138 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Balladur 318 | |
166 | 166 | 1999 | 1 | economic and monetary affairs | 166 | 0 | Spain 27 | Prodi | 0 | 15779 | Almunia, Joaquin | 2004-04-26 | 2009-10-31 | 1.03 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister employment | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Zapatero I 806 | |
186 | 186 | no formal party member | 1999 | 1 | economic and monetary affairs | 186 | 0 | Spain 27 | Prodi | 0 | 12745 | Solbes, Pedro | 1999-09-16 | 2004-04-25 | 1.64 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister economic and financial affairs | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Aznar I 370 |
191 | 191 | 2004 | 1 | economic and monetary affairs | 191 | 1 | Spain 27 | Barroso I | 1 | 15779 | Almunia, Joaquin | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.03 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister employment | doering | 10 | Zapatero I 806 | |
53 | 53 | 1973 | 1 | economic/financial affairs. credit/investment | 53 | 0 | Germany 54 | Ortoli | 1 | 2142 | Haferkamp, Wilhelm | 1973-01-06 | 1977-01-05 | 0.2 | Sozialdemokratische Partei Deutschlands 558 | 0 | member state assembly (NRW) | doering | 10 | Brandt II 871 | |
71 | 71 | 1977 | 0 | economics + finance/credits + investment/statistical office | 71 | 0 | France 43 | Jenkins | 1 | 4661 | Ortoli, Francois-Xavier | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 1.92 | Gaulliste 1094 | 0 | minister economy and finance | doering | 10 | Barre I 21 | |
88 | 88 | 1981 | 0 | economics+finance/credits+investment/statistical office | 88 | 0 | France 43 | Thorn | 1 | 4661 | Ortoli, Francois-Xavier | 1981-01-06 | 1984-10-26 | 1.92 | Gaulliste 1094 | 0 | minister economy and finance | doering | 10 | Barre II 72 | |
183 | 183 | 1999 | 1 | education and culture | 183 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Prodi | 0 | 1129 | Reding, Viviane | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.33 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | mp/mep | doering | 10 | Juncker II 196 | |
196 | 196 | 2004 | 1 | education. training. culture and mulitlingualism | 196 | 1 | Slovakia 1 | Barroso I | 0 | 5535 | Figel, Jan | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-01 | 0.5 | Kresťanskodemokratické hnutie 1432 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Dzurinda II 547 | |
153 | 153 | 1995 | 1 | employment and social affairs | 153 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Santer | 1 | 6689 | Flynn, Padraig | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 1.24 | Fianna Fáil 280 | 0 | minister justice | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Bruton 573 | |
172 | 172 | 1999 | 1 | employment and social affairs | 172 | 1 | Greece 41 | Prodi | 0 | 16154 | Diamantopoulou, Anna | 1999-09-16 | 2004-03-10 | 0.5 | Panellinio Sosialistikó Kínima 1338 | 0 | junior minister industry | doering | 10 | Simitis II 33 | |
173 | 173 | 1999 | 1 | employment and social affairs | 173 | 1 | Greece 41 | Prodi | 0 | 15665 | Dimas, Stavros | 2004-03-11 | 2009-10-31 | 0.99 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | minister industry | doering | 10 | Karamanlis Kos I 876 | |
212 | 212 | 2004 | 1 | employment. social affairs and equal opportunitis | 213 | 1 | Czech Republic 68 | Barroso I | 0 | 2947 | Spidla, Vladimir | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.96 | Česká strana sociálně demokratická 789 | 0 | prime minister | doering | 10 | Gross 580 | |
74 | 74 | 1977 | 1 | employment/social affairs/Tripartite Conference | 74 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Jenkins | 0 | 14619 | Vredeling, Henk | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 1.53 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | vice prime minister and Finance | doering | 10 | Den Uyl I 765 | |
27 | 27 | 1967 | 1 | energy | 27 | 0 | Germany 54 | Rey | 0 | 2142 | Haferkamp, Wilhelm | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.2 | Sozialdemokratische Partei Deutschlands 558 | 0 | member state assembly (NRW) | doering | 10 | Kiesinger 170 | |
41 | 41 | 1970 | 1 | energy | 41 | 0 | Germany 54 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 2142 | Haferkamp, Wilhelm | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.2 | Sozialdemokratische Partei Deutschlands 558 | 0 | member state assembly (NRW) | doering | 10 | Brandt I 358 | |
114 | 114 | 1989 | 1 | energy | 114 | 1 | Portugal 63 | Delors II | 0 | 13398 | Cardoso e Cunha, Antonio | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 0.83 | Partido Social Democrata 1273 | 0 | minister agriculture and fisheries | doering | 10 | Silva II 718 | |
208 | 208 | 2004 | 1 | energy | 209 | 1 | Latvia 55 | Barroso I | 0 | 16359 | Piebalgs, Andris | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.64 | Latvijas Ceļš 526 | 0 | minister finance | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Emsis 153 | |
161 | 161 | 1995 | 1 | energy and EURATOM | 161 | 1 | Greece 41 | Santer | 0 | 2471 | Papaoutsis, Christos | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 0.33 | Panellinio Sosialistikó Kínima 1338 | 0 | mep | doering | 10 | Papandreou A IV 74 | |
134 | 134 | 1993 | 1 | energy and transport | 134 | 0 | Spain 27 | Delors III | 1 | 15606 | Matutes, Abel | 1993-01-06 | 1994-04-27 | 0.33 | Alianza-Partido Popular 645 | 0 | mp | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Gonzalez III 37 | |
137 | 137 | 1993 | 1 | energy and transport | 137 | 0 | Spain 27 | Delors III | 0 | 1092 | Oreja Aguirre, Marcelino | 1994-04-27 | 1995-01-05 | 1.43 | Alianza-Partido Popular 645 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Gonzalez IV 654 | |
102 | 102 | 1985 | 1 | energy. Euratom | 102 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Delors I | 0 | 9661 | Mosar, Nicolas | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 0.33 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | mp -- secretary general of socialist party | doering | 10 | Santer I 175 | |
47 | 47 | 1973 | 0 | energy. research/science and education | 47 | 0 | Germany 54 | Ortoli | 0 | 16418 | Brunner, Guido | 1974-11-11 | 1977-01-05 | 0.2 | Freie Demokratische Partei 543 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Schmidt I 252 | |
187 | 187 | 1999 | 1 | enlargement | 187 | 0 | Germany 54 | Prodi | 0 | 5799 | Verheugen, Guenther | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.82 | Sozialdemokratische Partei Deutschlands 558 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Schroeder I 107 | |
211 | 211 | 2004 | 0 | enlargement | 212 | 1 | Finland 67 | Barroso I | 1 | 1265 | Rehn, Olli | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 0.33 | Keskusta 94 | 0 | mp/mep | doering | 10 | Vanhanen I 759 | |
70 | 70 | 1977 | 1 | enlargement/environment protection/nuclear safety | 70 | 0 | Italy 26 | Jenkins | 0 | 6114 | Natali, Lorenzo | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.83 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Andreotti III 140 | |
86 | 86 | 1981 | 1 | enlargement/environment protection/nuclear safety | 86 | 0 | Italy 26 | Thorn | 1 | 6114 | Natali, Lorenzo | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 0.83 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Forlani 464 | |
213 | 213 | 2004 | 1 | enterprise and industry | 214 | 1 | Germany 54 | Barroso I | 1 | 5799 | Verheugen, Guenther | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 0.82 | Sozialdemokratische Partei Deutschlands 558 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Schroeder II 529 | |
184 | 184 | 1999 | 0 | enterprise and information society | 184 | 1 | Finland 67 | Prodi | 0 | 1265 | Rehn, Olli | 2004-07-12 | 2004-11-21 | 0.33 | Keskusta 94 | 0 | mp/mep | doering | 10 | Vanhanen I 759 | |
124 | 124 | 1989 | 1 | environment | 124 | 0 | Italy 26 | Delors II | 1 | 10310 | Ripa di Meana, Carlo | 1989-01-06 | 1992-06-01 | 0.33 | Partito Socialista Italiano 1475 | 0 | mep | doering | 10 | De Mita 809 | |
138 | 138 | 1993 | 1 | environment | 138 | 1 | Greece 41 | Delors III | 0 | 9502 | Paleokrassas, Ioannis L. | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.64 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Mitsotakis Kon 362 | |
189 | 189 | 1999 | 1 | environment | 189 | 1 | Sweden 35 | Prodi | 0 | 1056 | Wallstroem, Margot | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 1.22 | Socialdemokraterna 904 | 0 | minister social affairs | doering | 10 | Persson II 503 |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE external_commissioner_doering("comment", "commission_year", "elected", "portfolio", "id", "one_seat", "country_id", "commission_name", "incumbent", "person_id", "person_id_source", "start_date", "end_date", "score_position", "party_id", "president", "highest_position", "data_source", "government_party", "previous_cabinet_id", FOREIGN KEY([country_id]) REFERENCES [country]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([party_id]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([data_source]) REFERENCES [info_data_source]([key]), FOREIGN KEY([government_party]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([previous_cabinet_id]) REFERENCES [cabinet]([id]) );