external_commissioner_doering
Data source: ParlGov · About: simonw/parlgov-datasette
308 rows sorted by portfolio
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: comment, commission_year, elected, one_seat, country_id, commission_name, president, data_source, start_date (date), end_date (date)
Link | rowid | comment | commission_year | elected | portfolio ▼ | id | one_seat | country_id | commission_name | incumbent | person_id | person_id_source | start_date | end_date | score_position | party_id | president | highest_position | data_source | government_party | previous_cabinet_id |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 10 | 1958 | 1 | 10 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Hallstein I | 0 | 4128 | Schaus, Lambert | 1958-01-10 | 1962-01-09 | 1.07 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | minister economy and defense | doering | 10 | Bech V 500 | ||
20 | 20 | 1962 | 1 | 20 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Hallstein II | 1 | 4128 | Schaus, Lambert | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 1.07 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | minister economy and defense | doering | 10 | Werner I 832 | ||
307 | 307 | 2019 | 311 | 1 | Estonia 75 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17182 | Kadri Simson | 2019-12-01 | 1.21 | Eesti Keskerakond 1137 | 0 | minister of economic affairs and infrastructure | 10 | Ratas II 1595 | |||||
286 | 286 | 2019 | 1 | A Stronger Europe in the World | 290 | 1 | Spain 27 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 1468 | Josep Borrell Fontelles | 2019-12-01 | 1.43 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister of foreign affairs | 10 | Sanchez II 1601 | |||
55 | 55 | 1973 | 1 | Agriculture | 55 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Ortoli | 0 | 16291 | Lardinois, Petrus J. | 1973-01-06 | 1977-01-05 | 0.74 | Katholieke Volkspartij 451 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Biesheuvel II 291 | |
296 | 296 | 2019 | 1 | Agriculture | 300 | 1 | Poland 74 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 13482 | Janusz Wojciechowski | 2019-12-01 | 0.33 | Prawo i Sprawiedliwość 528 | 0 | mep | 10 | Morawiecki II 1611 | |||
272 | 272 | 2014 | 1 | Agriculture & Rural Development | 276 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Juncker | 0 | 16586 | Hogan, Phil | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.93 | Fine Gael 1393 | 0 | minister of environment | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Kenny I 904 | |
285 | 285 | 2019 | 1 | An Economy that Works for People | 289 | 1 | Latvia 55 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 11889 | Valdis Dombrovskis | 2019-12-01 | 2.14 | Vienotība 1666 | 0 | prime minister | 10 | Karins I 1592 | |||
255 | 255 | 2014 | 1 | Better Regulation, Inter-Institutional Relations, the Rule of Law and the Charter of Fundamental Rights | 259 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Juncker | 0 | 17107 | Timmermans, Frans | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.16 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Rutte III 1041 | |
256 | 256 | 2014 | 0 | Budget & Human Resources | 260 | 1 | Bulgaria 10 | Juncker | 1 | 16870 | Georgieva, Kristalina | 2014-11-01 | 2016-12-31 | 0.2 | Grazhdani za Evropeysko Razvitie na Balgariya 1541 | 0 | vice president world bank, professor | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Bliznashki 1139 | |
291 | 291 | 2019 | 1 | Budget and Administration | 295 | 1 | Austria 59 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 1416 | Johannes Hahn | 2019-12-01 | 0.89 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | federal minister of science and research | dr-08 | 10 | Bierlein II 1608 | ||
265 | 265 | 2014 | 1 | Climate Action & Energy | 269 | 1 | Spain 27 | Juncker | 0 | 4248 | Arias Cañete, Miguel | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.92 | Alianza-Partido Popular 645 | 0 | minister for agriculture, food and environment | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Rajoy I 988 | |
298 | 298 | 2019 | 1 | Cohesion and Reforms | 302 | Portugal 63 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 7429 | Elisa Ferreira | 2019-12-01 | 0.81 | Partido Socialista 725 | 0 | minister for environment | 10 | Costa II 1610 | ||||
278 | 278 | 2014 | 1 | Competition | 282 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Juncker | 0 | 15513 | Vestager, Margrethe | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.27 | Det Radikale Venstre 211 | 0 | minister of economy and interior | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Thorning-Schmidt II 1074 | |
280 | 280 | 2010 | 1 | Consumer Policy | 284 | 1 | Croatia 62 | Barroso II | 0 | 17109 | Mimica, Neven | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.16 | Socijaldemokratska partija Hrvatske 1493 | 0 | deputy prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Kosor I 1055 | |
303 | 303 | 2019 | 0 | Crisis Management | 307 | 1 | Slovenia 60 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17180 | Janez Lenarčič | 2019-12-01 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1370 | 0 | diplomat | 12 | Sarec 1555 | |||
289 | 289 | 2019 | 1 | Democracy and Demography | 293 | 1 | Croatia 62 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17175 | Dubravka Šuica | 2019-12-01 | 0.2 | Hrvatska demokratska zajednica 276 | 0 | mayor | 10 | Plenkovic II 1512 | |||
261 | 261 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Kristalina Georgieva since 2017-01-01? (Budget and Human Resources) | 2014 | 1 | Digital Economy & Society [+ Budget and Human Resources since 2017-01-01] | 265 | 1 | Germany 54 | Juncker | 1 | 16863 | Oettinger, Günther | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.0 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | minister-president of a federral German state | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Merkel III 1071 |
282 | 282 | 2014 | 1 | Digital Economy and Society | 286 | 1 | Bulgaria 10 | Juncker | 0 | 17163 | Gabriel, Mariya | 2017-07-07 | 2019-11-30 | 0.33 | Grazhdani za Evropeysko Razvitie na Balgariya 1541 | 0 | MEP | 10 | Borisov III 1505 | ||
257 | 257 | 2014 | 1 | Digital Single Market | 261 | 1 | Estonia 75 | Juncker | 0 | 96 | Ansip, Andrus | 2014-11-01 | 2019-07-01 | 2.25 | Eesti Reformierakond 113 | 0 | prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Roivas I 1095 | |
125 | 125 | 1989 | 1 | EC budget and financial control | 125 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors II | 1 | 12760 | Schmidhuber, Peter | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 0.2 | Christlich Soziale Union 1180 | 0 | state junior minister in Bavaria | doering | 10 | Kohl III 286 | |
270 | 270 | 2014 | 1 | Economic and Financial Affairs, Taxation and Customs | 274 | 1 | France 43 | Juncker | 0 | 7675 | Moscovici, Pierre | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.92 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | minister of finance | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Valls II 1141 | |
295 | 295 | 2019 | 1 | Economy | 299 | 1 | Italy 26 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17177 | Paolo Gentiloni | 2019-12-01 | 2.48 | Partito Democratico 382 | 0 | prime minister | dw-05 | 10 | Conte II 1603 | ||
276 | 276 | 2014 | 1 | Education, Culture, Youth and Citizenship | 280 | 1 | Hungary 39 | Juncker | 0 | 17112 | Navracsics, Tibor | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.51 | Fidesz – Magyar Polgári Szövetség 921 | 0 | minister of foreign affairs and trade | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Orban III 1104 | |
269 | 269 | 2014 | 1 | Employment, Social Affairs, Skills and Labour Mobility | 273 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Juncker | 0 | 8076 | Thyssen, Marianne | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.33 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | mp/mep | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Michel I 1147 | |
266 | 266 | 2014 | 1 | Environment, Maritime Affairs and Fisheries | 270 | 1 | Malta 72 | Juncker | 0 | 10616 | Vella, Karmenu | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.68 | Partit Laburista 1003 | 0 | minister of tourism | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Muscat I 1046 | |
308 | 308 | 2019 | 1 | Environment, Oceans and Fisheries | 312 | 1 | Lithuania 15 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17183 | Virginijus Sinkevičius | 2019-12-01 | 1.47 | Lietuvos valstiečių sąjunga 191 | 0 | minister of economy and innovation | dr-08 | 10 | Skvernelis III 1615 | ||
301 | 301 | 2019 | 1 | Equality | 305 | 1 | Malta 72 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17179 | Helena Dalli | 2019-12-01 | 1.0 | Partit Laburista 1003 | 0 | minister of european affairs and equality | 10 | Muscat II 1504 | |||
258 | 258 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Jonathan Hill since 2016-07-16? (Financial Stability, Financial Services and Capital Markets Union) | 2014 | 1 | Euro & Social Dialogue [+ Financial Stability, Financial Services and Capital Markets Union since 2016-07-16] | 262 | 1 | Latvia 55 | Juncker | 0 | 11889 | Dombrovskis, Valdis | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 2.14 | Vienotība 1666 | 0 | prime minister | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Straujuma I 1073 |
284 | 284 | 2019 | 1 | European Green Deal | 288 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 17107 | Frans Timmermans | 2019-12-01 | 1.16 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister of foreign affairs | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Rutte V 1530 | |||
262 | 262 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Corina Cretu since 2019-07-03? (Regional Policy) | 2014 | 1 | European Neighbourhood Policy & Enlargement Negotiations [+ Regional Policy since 2019-07-03] | 266 | 1 | Austria 59 | Juncker | 1 | 1416 | Hahn, Johannes | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.89 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | federal minister of science and research | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Faymann II 1070 |
31 | 31 | 1967 | 1 | External Affairs | 31 | 0 | Italy 26 | Rey | 0 | 3980 | Martino, Edoardo | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.46 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | junior minister foreign affairs | doering | 10 | Moro III 433 | |
273 | 273 | 2014 | 1 | Financial Stability, Financial Services and Capital Markets Union | 277 | 1 | United Kingdom 44 | Juncker | 0 | 17115 | Hill, Jonathan | 2014-11-01 | 2016-07-15 | 1.0 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | leader of the house of Lords, chancelor of duekdom | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Cameron I 874 | |
218 | 218 | 2004 | 1 | Health | 222 | 1 | Cyprus 51 | Barroso I | 0 | 12688 | Vassiliou, Androulla | 2008-03-03 | 2009-10-31 | 0.33 | Enomeni Dimokrates 1523 | 0 | mp/mep | ec.europa.eu | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Christofias I 289 | |
267 | 267 | 2014 | 1 | Health & Food Safety | 271 | 1 | Lithuania 15 | Juncker | 0 | 17117 | Andriukaitis, Vytenis | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.97 | Lietuvos socialdemokratų partija 1277 | 0 | minister of health | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Butkevicius II 1633 | |
299 | 299 | 2019 | 1 | Health and Food Safety | 303 | 1 | Cyprus 51 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17178 | Stella Kyriakides | 2019-12-01 | 0.33 | Dimokratikós Sinayermós 1575 | 0 | mp | 10 | Anastasiades IV 1628 | |||
302 | 302 | 2019 | 1 | Home Affairs | 306 | 1 | Sweden 35 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 4867 | Ylva Johansson | 2019-12-01 | 1.26 | Socialdemokraterna 904 | 0 | minister of employment | dw-05 | 10 | Lofven III 1590 | ||
271 | 271 | 2014 | 1 | Humanitarian Aid & Crisis Management | 275 | 1 | Cyprus 51 | Juncker | 0 | 17116 | Stylianides, Christos | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.33 | Dimokratikós Sinayermós 1575 | 0 | mp/mep | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Anastasiades II 1086 | |
293 | 293 | 2019 | 1 | Innovation, Research, Culture, Education and Youth | 297 | 1 | Bulgaria 10 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 17163 | Mariya Gabriel | 2019-12-01 | 0.33 | Grazhdani za Evropeysko Razvitie na Balgariya 1541 | 0 | mep | 10 | Borisov III 1505 | |||
287 | 287 | 2019 | 0 | Interinstitutional Relations and Foresight | 291 | 1 | Slovakia 1 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 16865 | Šefčovič, Maroš | 2019-12-01 | 0.2 | Smer – sociálna demokracia 220 | 0 | diplomat | 10 | Pellegrini 1529 | |||
297 | 297 | 2019 | Internal Market | 301 | 1 | France 43 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 8103 | Thierry Breton | 2019-12-01 | 1.92 | sans étiquette 947 | 0 | minister of economy, finance and industry | dw-05 | 12 | Philippe II 1509 | |||
274 | 274 | 2014 | 1 | Internal Market, Industry, Entrepreneurship and SMEs | 278 | 1 | Poland 74 | Juncker | 0 | 17114 | Bieńkowska, Elżbieta | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.42 | Platforma Obywatelska 512 | 0 | deputy prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Kopacz 1146 | |
264 | 264 | 2014 | 1 | International Cooperation & Development | 268 | 1 | Croatia 62 | Juncker | 0 | 17109 | Mimica, Neven | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.18 | Socijaldemokratska partija Hrvatske 1493 | 0 | minister for eu integration | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Milanovic 1056 | |
306 | 306 | 2019 | 1 | International Partnerships | 310 | 1 | Finland 67 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 16990 | Jutta Urpilainen | 2019-12-01 | 1.0 | Suomen Sosialidemokraattinen Puolue – Finlands Socialdemokratiska Parti 395 | 0 | minister of finance and deputy minister | dw-05 | 10 | Rinne 1596 | ||
294 | 294 | 2019 | 1 | Jobs and Social Rights | 298 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17176 | Nicolas Schmitt | 2019-12-01 | 0.33 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | mep | 10 | Bettel II 1588 | |||
259 | 259 | 2014 | 1 | Jobs, Growth, Investment and Competitiveness | 263 | 1 | Finland 67 | Juncker | 1 | 16803 | Katainen, Jyrki | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 2.53 | Kansallinen Kokoomus – Samlingspartiet 1118 | 0 | prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Stubb II 1145 | |
300 | 300 | 2019 | Justice | 304 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 10682 | Didier Reynders | 2019-12-01 | 1.35 | Mouvement Réformateur 915 | 0 | minister of finance | dw-05 | 10 | Wilmes I 1622 | |||
275 | 275 | druckman_roberts 2008: housing and regions | 2014 | 1 | Justice, Consumers and Gender Equality | 279 | 1 | Czech Republic 68 | Juncker | 0 | 17113 | Jourová, Vĕra | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.95 | Akce nespokojených občanů 2011 2263 | 0 | minister for regional development | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Sobotka 1072 |
268 | 268 | 2014 | 1 | Migration & Home Affairs | 272 | 1 | Greece 41 | Juncker | 0 | 8210 | Avramopoulos, Dimitris | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.91 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | minister of defence | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Samaras II 1060 | |
305 | 305 | 2019 | 0 | Neighbourhood and Enlargement | 309 | 1 | Hungary 39 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 17181 | Olivér Várhelyi | 2019-12-01 | 0.2 | Fidesz – Magyar Polgári Szövetség 921 | 0 | bureaucrat | 10 | Orban IV 1531 | |||
290 | 290 | 2019 | 1 | Promoting our European Way of Life | 294 | 1 | Greece 41 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 7024 | Margaritis Schinas | 2019-12-01 | 0.33 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | mep | 10 | Mitsotakis Kyr 1597 | |||
277 | 277 | Maybe add party change? Cretu joined PRO Romania in 2019 (January/March ?), but was not able to get re-elected into the European Parliament in May 2019 | 2014 | 1 | Regional Policy | 281 | 1 | Romania 23 | Juncker | 0 | 17111 | Creţu, Corina | 2014-11-01 | 2019-07-01 | 0.33 | Partidul Social Democrat 1120 | 0 | mp/mep | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Ponta III 1085 |
279 | 279 | 2014 | 1 | Research, Science and Innovation | 283 | 1 | Portugal 63 | Juncker | 0 | 17110 | Moedas, Carlos | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.5 | Partido Social Democrata 1273 | 0 | secretary of state | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Passos Coelho I 917 | |
263 | 263 | 2014 | 1 | Trade | 267 | 1 | Sweden 35 | Juncker | 1 | 9042 | Malmström, Cecilia | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.0 | Folkpartiet 892 | 0 | minister für eu affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Lofven I 1149 | |
292 | 292 | 2019 | 1 | Trade | 296 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 16586 | Phil Hogan | 2019-12-01 | 0.93 | Fine Gael 1393 | 0 | minister of environment | dr-08 | 10 | Varadkar I 1511 | ||
304 | 304 | 2019 | 1 | Transport | 308 | 1 | Romania 23 | Von der Leyen | 0 | 32 | Adina Vălean | 2019-12-01 | 0.33 | Partidul Naţional Liberal 1015 | 0 | mep/mp | 10 | Orban I 1619 | |||
260 | 260 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Andrus Ansip since 2019-07-03? (Digital Single Market) | 2014 | 0 | Transport & Space [+ Digital Single Market since 2019-07-03] | 264 | 1 | Slovakia 1 | Juncker | 1 | 16865 | Šefčovič, Maroš | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.2 | Smer – sociálna demokracia 220 | 0 | diplomat | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Fico II 1027 |
23 | 23 | 1967 | 1 | Transport policy | 23 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Rey | 0 | 6040 | Bodson, Victor | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 1.07 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | minister justice | doering | 10 | Werner II 491 | |
288 | 288 | 2019 | 1 | Values and Transparency | 292 | 1 | Czech Republic 68 | Von der Leyen | 1 | 17113 | Jourová, Vĕra | 2019-12-01 | 0.95 | Akce nespokojených občanů 2011 2263 | 0 | minister for regional development | dw-05 | 10 | Babis II 1534 | ||
201 | 201 | 2004 | 1 | administrative affairs. audit and anti-fraud | 201 | 1 | Estonia 75 | Barroso I | 0 | 16396 | Kallas, Siim | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 2.25 | Eesti Reformierakond 113 | 0 | prime minister | doering | 10 | Parts 138 | |
6 | 6 | 1958 | 1 | agriculture | 6 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Hallstein I | 0 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1958-01-10 | 1962-01-09 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Drees IV 761 | |
15 | 15 | 1962 | 1 | agriculture | 15 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Hallstein II | 1 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | De Quay 694 | |
30 | 30 | 1967 | 1 | agriculture | 30 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Rey | 1 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | De Jong 172 | |
42 | 42 | 1970 | 1 | agriculture | 42 | 0 | Italy 26 | Malfatti/Manshold | 0 | 1158 | Scarascia-Mugnozza, Carlo | 1972-03-22 | 1973-01-05 | 0.46 | Democrazia Cristiana 1633 | 0 | junior minister justice | doering | 10 | Andreotti I 398 | |
45 | 45 | 1970 | 1 | agriculture | 45 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 11499 | Mansholt, Sicco Leendert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.74 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 1 | minister agriculture | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | De Jong 172 | |
80 | 80 | 1981 | 1 | agriculture | 80 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Thorn | 0 | 16571 | Dalsager, Poul | 1981-01-20 | 1985-01-05 | 1.0 | Socialdemokraterne 1629 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Jorgensen V 379 | |
83 | 83 | 1981 | 0 | agriculture | 83 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Thorn | 1 | 14835 | Gundelach, Finn Olav | 1981-01-06 | 1981-01-13 | 0.2 | ingen 1128 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Jorgensen V 379 | |
119 | 119 | 1989 | 1 | agriculture | 119 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Delors II | 0 | 16728 | McSharry, Ray | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.83 | Fianna Fáil 280 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Haughey III 77 | |
143 | 143 | 1993 | 1 | agriculture | 143 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Delors III | 0 | 5363 | Steichen, Rene | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.07 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 0 | minister agriculture | doering | 10 | Santer II 418 | |
68 | 68 | 1977 | 0 | agriculture and fisheries | 68 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Jenkins | 1 | 14835 | Gundelach, Finn Olav | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.2 | ingen 1128 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Jorgensen II 50 | |
152 | 152 | 1995 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 152 | 1 | Austria 59 | Santer | 0 | 2619 | Fischler, Franz | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 0.86 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | minister agriculture and forestry | doering | 10 | Vranitzky IV 294 | |
174 | 174 | 1999 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 174 | 1 | Austria 59 | Prodi | 1 | 2619 | Fischler, Franz | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.86 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | minister agriculture and forestry | doering | 10 | Klima I 412 | |
197 | 197 | 2004 | 0 | agriculture and rural development | 197 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Barroso I | 0 | 1017 | Fischer Boel, Mariann | 2004-11-22 | 2009-10-31 | 1.0 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister food. agriculture and fisheries | doering | 10 | Rasmussen F I 482 | |
229 | 229 | member cabinett Popescu-Tariceanu III; Duration: 2007-04-05 – 2008-11-30. at the time of nomination other parties were in power | 2010 | 1 | agriculture and rural development | 233 | 1 | Romania 23 | Barroso II | 0 | 16867 | Cioloş, Dacian | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 0.97 | no party affiliation 761 | 0 | minister agriculture and rural development | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Boc II 993 |
93 | 93 | 1985 | 0 | agriculture. fisheries | 93 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Delors I | 1 | 13160 | Andriessen, Frans | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 2.02 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Lubbers I 270 | |
141 | 141 | 1993 | 1 | budget | 141 | 0 | Germany 54 | Delors III | 1 | 12760 | Schmidhuber, Peter | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 0.2 | Christlich Soziale Union 1180 | 0 | state junior minister in Bavaria | doering | 10 | Kohl IV 862 | |
156 | 156 | 1995 | 1 | budget | 156 | 1 | Finland 67 | Santer | 0 | 5160 | Liikanen, Erkki Antero | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 2.01 | Suomen Sosialidemokraattinen Puolue – Finlands Socialdemokratiska Parti 395 | 0 | minister finance | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Aho II 206 | |
177 | 177 | 1999 | 1 | budget | 177 | 1 | Finland 67 | Prodi | 1 | 5160 | Liikanen, Erkki Antero | 1999-09-16 | 2004-07-11 | 2.01 | Suomen Sosialidemokraattinen Puolue – Finlands Socialdemokratiska Parti 395 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Lipponen II 352 | |
185 | 185 | 1999 | 1 | budget | 185 | 0 | Germany 54 | Prodi | 0 | 2882 | Schreyer, Michaele | 1999-09-16 | 2004-11-21 | 0.2 | Bündnis 90 / Die Grünen 772 | 0 | minister of a german state | doering | 10 | Schroeder I 107 | |
72 | 72 | 1977 | 1 | budget a financial control. finacial institutions | 72 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Jenkins | 0 | 5942 | Tugendhat, Christopher S. | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.33 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | mep | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Callaghan 590 | |
91 | 91 | 1981 | 1 | budget a financial control. finacial institutions | 91 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Thorn | 1 | 5942 | Tugendhat, Christopher S. | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 0.33 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | mep | doering | 10 | Thatcher I 273 | |
24 | 24 | 1967 | 1 | budget and finance | 24 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Rey | 0 | 8852 | Coppe, Albert | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 1.02 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | minister economy | doering | 10 | Vanden Boeynants I 353 | |
38 | 38 | 1970 | 1 | budget and finance | 38 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Malfatti/Manshold | 1 | 8852 | Coppe, Albert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 1.02 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | minister economy | doering | 10 | Eyskens G IV 586 | |
96 | 96 | 1985 | 1 | budget. financial control. personnel | 96 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Delors I | 0 | 6634 | Christophersen, Henning | 1985-01-06 | 1989-01-05 | 1.88 | Venstre 1605 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Schluter II 195 | |
237 | 237 | 2010 | 1 | climate action | 241 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Barroso II | 0 | 6095 | Hedegaard, Connie | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.33 | Konservative 590 | 0 | minister environment | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Rasmussen L I 71 | |
67 | 67 | 1977 | 1 | community funds and regional policy | 67 | 0 | Italy 26 | Jenkins | 0 | 8614 | Giolitti, Antonio | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 0.98 | Partito Socialista Italiano 1475 | 0 | minister budget and economic planning | doering | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Andreotti III 140 | |
82 | 82 | 1981 | 1 | community funds and regional policy | 82 | 0 | Italy 26 | Thorn | 1 | 8614 | Giolitti, Antonio | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 0.98 | Partito Socialista Italiano 1475 | 0 | minister budget and economic planning | doering | 10 | Forlani 464 | |
2 | 2 | 1958 | 0 | competition | 2 | 0 | Germany 54 | Hallstein I | 0 | 16293 | Groeben, Hans von der | 1958-01-10 | 1962-01-09 | 0.2 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Adenauer V 793 | |
13 | 13 | 1962 | 0 | competition | 13 | 0 | Germany 54 | Hallstein II | 1 | 16293 | Groeben, Hans von der | 1962-01-10 | 1967-07-05 | 0.2 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Adenauer VII 62 | |
26 | 26 | 1967 | 0 | competition | 26 | 0 | Germany 54 | Rey | 1 | 16293 | Groeben, Hans von der | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.2 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 10 | Kiesinger 170 | |
34 | 34 | 1967 | 1 | competition | 34 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Rey | 0 | 12016 | Sassen, Emmanuel | 1967-07-06 | 1970-06-30 | 0.35 | Katholieke Volkspartij 451 | 0 | minister colonies. head of ep party group | doering | 10 | De Jong 172 | |
73 | 73 | 1977 | 1 | competition | 73 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Jenkins | 1 | 12256 | Vouel, Raymond | 1977-01-06 | 1981-01-05 | 1.53 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | vice prime minister and finance minister | doering | 10 | Thorn 655 | |
76 | 76 | 1981 | 0 | competition | 76 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Thorn | 0 | 13160 | Andriessen, Frans | 1981-01-06 | 1985-01-05 | 2.02 | Christen Democratisch Appèl 235 | 0 | minister finance | doering | 10 | Van Agt I 563 | |
135 | 135 | 1993 | 1 | competition | 135 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Delors III | 1 | 2416 | Miert, Karl van | 1993-01-06 | 1995-01-05 | 1.0 | Socialistische Partij 1029 | 0 | leader oppostion party | doering | 10 | Dehaene I 624 | |
158 | 158 | 1995 | 1 | competition | 158 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Santer | 1 | 2416 | Miert, Karl van | 1995-01-06 | 1999-03-15 | 1.0 | Socialistische Partij 1029 | 0 | leader oppostion party | doering | 10 | Dehaene I 624 | |
225 | 225 | 2010 | 1 | competition | 229 | 1 | Spain 27 | Barroso II | 1 | 15779 | Almunia, Joaquin | 2010-02-10 | 2014-10-31 | 1.03 | Partido Socialista Obrero Español 902 | 0 | minister employment | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Zapatero II 497 | |
46 | 46 | 1973 | 0 | competition policy | 46 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Ortoli | 1 | 8219 | Borschette, Albert | 1973-01-06 | 1976-12-08 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Werner III 101 | |
61 | 61 | 1973 | 1 | competition policy | 61 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Ortoli | 0 | 12256 | Vouel, Raymond | 1976-07-20 | 1977-01-05 | 1.53 | Lëtzebuerger Sozialistesch Aarbechterpartei 701 | 0 | vice prime minister and finance minister | doering | 10 | Thorn 655 | |
113 | 113 | 1989 | 1 | competition policy and finacial services | 113 | 0 | United Kingdom 44 | Delors II | 0 | 14789 | Brittan, Leon | 1989-01-06 | 1993-01-05 | 1.32 | Conservatives 773 | 0 | minister interior | doering | 10 | Thatcher III 297 | |
37 | 37 | 1970 | 0 | competition. regional policy | 37 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Malfatti/Manshold | 0 | 8219 | Borschette, Albert | 1970-07-01 | 1973-01-05 | 0.2 | no party affiliation 1002 | 0 | diplomat | doering | 12 | Werner III 101 |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE external_commissioner_doering("comment", "commission_year", "elected", "portfolio", "id", "one_seat", "country_id", "commission_name", "incumbent", "person_id", "person_id_source", "start_date", "end_date", "score_position", "party_id", "president", "highest_position", "data_source", "government_party", "previous_cabinet_id", FOREIGN KEY([country_id]) REFERENCES [country]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([party_id]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([data_source]) REFERENCES [info_data_source]([key]), FOREIGN KEY([government_party]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([previous_cabinet_id]) REFERENCES [cabinet]([id]) );