external_commissioner_doering
Data source: ParlGov · About: simonw/parlgov-datasette
25 rows where "end_date" is on date 2019-11-30 sorted by previous_cabinet_id
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: comment, elected, incumbent, start_date, score_position, president, highest_position, data_source, government_party, start_date (date)
Link | rowid | comment | commission_year | elected | portfolio | id | one_seat | country_id | commission_name | incumbent | person_id | person_id_source | start_date | end_date | score_position | party_id | president | highest_position | data_source | government_party | previous_cabinet_id ▼ |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
272 | 272 | 2014 | 1 | Agriculture & Rural Development | 276 | 1 | Ireland 37 | Juncker | 0 | 16586 | Hogan, Phil | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.93 | Fine Gael 1393 | 0 | minister of environment | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Kenny I 904 | |
279 | 279 | 2014 | 1 | Research, Science and Innovation | 283 | 1 | Portugal 63 | Juncker | 0 | 17110 | Moedas, Carlos | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.5 | Partido Social Democrata 1273 | 0 | secretary of state | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Passos Coelho I 917 | |
265 | 265 | 2014 | 1 | Climate Action & Energy | 269 | 1 | Spain 27 | Juncker | 0 | 4248 | Arias Cañete, Miguel | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.92 | Alianza-Partido Popular 645 | 0 | minister for agriculture, food and environment | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Rajoy I 988 | |
260 | 260 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Andrus Ansip since 2019-07-03? (Digital Single Market) | 2014 | 0 | Transport & Space [+ Digital Single Market since 2019-07-03] | 264 | 1 | Slovakia 1 | Juncker | 1 | 16865 | Šefčovič, Maroš | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.2 | Smer – sociálna demokracia 220 | 0 | diplomat | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Fico II 1027 |
255 | 255 | 2014 | 1 | Better Regulation, Inter-Institutional Relations, the Rule of Law and the Charter of Fundamental Rights | 259 | 1 | Netherlands 8 | Juncker | 0 | 17107 | Timmermans, Frans | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.16 | Partij van de Arbeid 742 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Rutte III 1041 | |
266 | 266 | 2014 | 1 | Environment, Maritime Affairs and Fisheries | 270 | 1 | Malta 72 | Juncker | 0 | 10616 | Vella, Karmenu | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.68 | Partit Laburista 1003 | 0 | minister of tourism | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Muscat I 1046 | |
264 | 264 | 2014 | 1 | International Cooperation & Development | 268 | 1 | Croatia 62 | Juncker | 0 | 17109 | Mimica, Neven | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.18 | Socijaldemokratska partija Hrvatske 1493 | 0 | minister for eu integration | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Milanovic 1056 | |
268 | 268 | 2014 | 1 | Migration & Home Affairs | 272 | 1 | Greece 41 | Juncker | 0 | 8210 | Avramopoulos, Dimitris | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.91 | Néa Đimokratía 47 | 0 | minister of defence | ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Samaras II 1060 | |
253 | 253 | 2014 | 1 | president | 257 | 1 | Luxembourg 7 | Juncker | 0 | 2240 | Juncker, Jean-Claude | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 2.17 | Chrëschtlech Sozial Vollekspartei 1234 | 1 | prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | Aliança Povo Unido 11 | Bettel I 1069 | |
262 | 262 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Corina Cretu since 2019-07-03? (Regional Policy) | 2014 | 1 | European Neighbourhood Policy & Enlargement Negotiations [+ Regional Policy since 2019-07-03] | 266 | 1 | Austria 59 | Juncker | 1 | 1416 | Hahn, Johannes | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.89 | Österreichische Volkspartei 1013 | 0 | federal minister of science and research | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Faymann II 1070 |
261 | 261 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Kristalina Georgieva since 2017-01-01? (Budget and Human Resources) | 2014 | 1 | Digital Economy & Society [+ Budget and Human Resources since 2017-01-01] | 265 | 1 | Germany 54 | Juncker | 1 | 16863 | Oettinger, Günther | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.0 | Christlich Demokratische Union 808 | 0 | minister-president of a federral German state | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Merkel III 1071 |
275 | 275 | druckman_roberts 2008: housing and regions | 2014 | 1 | Justice, Consumers and Gender Equality | 279 | 1 | Czech Republic 68 | Juncker | 0 | 17113 | Jourová, Vĕra | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.95 | Akce nespokojených občanů 2011 2263 | 0 | minister for regional development | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Sobotka 1072 |
258 | 258 | Add second entry for succeeding Commission office of Jonathan Hill since 2016-07-16? (Financial Stability, Financial Services and Capital Markets Union) | 2014 | 1 | Euro & Social Dialogue [+ Financial Stability, Financial Services and Capital Markets Union since 2016-07-16] | 262 | 1 | Latvia 55 | Juncker | 0 | 11889 | Dombrovskis, Valdis | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 2.14 | Vienotība 1666 | 0 | prime minister | ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Straujuma I 1073 |
278 | 278 | 2014 | 1 | Competition | 282 | 1 | Denmark 21 | Juncker | 0 | 15513 | Vestager, Margrethe | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.27 | Det Radikale Venstre 211 | 0 | minister of economy and interior | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Thorning-Schmidt II 1074 | |
254 | 254 | 2014 | 1 | high representative of the union for foreign affairs and security policy | 258 | 1 | Italy 26 | Juncker | 0 | 17106 | Mogherini, Federica | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.69 | Partito Democratico 382 | 0 | minister foreign affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Renzi 1079 | |
271 | 271 | 2014 | 1 | Humanitarian Aid & Crisis Management | 275 | 1 | Cyprus 51 | Juncker | 0 | 17116 | Stylianides, Christos | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.33 | Dimokratikós Sinayermós 1575 | 0 | mp/mep | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Anastasiades II 1086 | |
276 | 276 | 2014 | 1 | Education, Culture, Youth and Citizenship | 280 | 1 | Hungary 39 | Juncker | 0 | 17112 | Navracsics, Tibor | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.51 | Fidesz – Magyar Polgári Szövetség 921 | 0 | minister of foreign affairs and trade | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Orban III 1104 | |
270 | 270 | 2014 | 1 | Economic and Financial Affairs, Taxation and Customs | 274 | 1 | France 43 | Juncker | 0 | 7675 | Moscovici, Pierre | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.92 | Parti socialiste 1539 | 0 | minister of finance | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Valls II 1141 | |
281 | 281 | 2014 | 1 | transport | 285 | 1 | Slovenia 60 | Juncker | 0 | 17121 | Bulc, Violeta | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.07 | Stranka modernega 2333 | 0 | minister without portfolio | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Cerar 1144 | |
259 | 259 | 2014 | 1 | Jobs, Growth, Investment and Competitiveness | 263 | 1 | Finland 67 | Juncker | 1 | 16803 | Katainen, Jyrki | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 2.53 | Kansallinen Kokoomus – Samlingspartiet 1118 | 0 | prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Stubb II 1145 | |
274 | 274 | 2014 | 1 | Internal Market, Industry, Entrepreneurship and SMEs | 278 | 1 | Poland 74 | Juncker | 0 | 17114 | Bieńkowska, Elżbieta | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.42 | Platforma Obywatelska 512 | 0 | deputy prime minister | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Kopacz 1146 | |
269 | 269 | 2014 | 1 | Employment, Social Affairs, Skills and Labour Mobility | 273 | 1 | Belgium 64 | Juncker | 0 | 8076 | Thyssen, Marianne | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.33 | Christelijke Volkspartij | Christen-Democratisch en Vlaams 723 | 0 | mp/mep | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Michel I 1147 | |
263 | 263 | 2014 | 1 | Trade | 267 | 1 | Sweden 35 | Juncker | 1 | 9042 | Malmström, Cecilia | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 1.0 | Folkpartiet 892 | 0 | minister für eu affairs | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, munzinger, parlgov | 10 | Lofven I 1149 | |
282 | 282 | 2014 | 1 | Digital Economy and Society | 286 | 1 | Bulgaria 10 | Juncker | 0 | 17163 | Gabriel, Mariya | 2017-07-07 | 2019-11-30 | 0.33 | Grazhdani za Evropeysko Razvitie na Balgariya 1541 | 0 | MEP | 10 | Borisov III 1505 | ||
267 | 267 | 2014 | 1 | Health & Food Safety | 271 | 1 | Lithuania 15 | Juncker | 0 | 17117 | Andriukaitis, Vytenis | 2014-11-01 | 2019-11-30 | 0.97 | Lietuvos socialdemokratų partija 1277 | 0 | minister of health | dr-08, dw-05, ec.europa.eu, parlgov | 10 | Butkevicius II 1633 |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE external_commissioner_doering("comment", "commission_year", "elected", "portfolio", "id", "one_seat", "country_id", "commission_name", "incumbent", "person_id", "person_id_source", "start_date", "end_date", "score_position", "party_id", "president", "highest_position", "data_source", "government_party", "previous_cabinet_id", FOREIGN KEY([country_id]) REFERENCES [country]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([party_id]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([data_source]) REFERENCES [info_data_source]([key]), FOREIGN KEY([government_party]) REFERENCES [party]([id]), FOREIGN KEY([previous_cabinet_id]) REFERENCES [cabinet]([id]) );